AZ HB2140 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

License plate designs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License plate designs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2021-03-24SenateSenate TAT Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-22SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate TAT Committee
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-1-0)
2021-02-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-01HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-01-21HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2021-01-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282351Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74555
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2140p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2140h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2140kerr.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2140townsend1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2140approp.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481539
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482391
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482901
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488274
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488481
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74555&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74555&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74555&billStatusActionId=200054&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74555&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74555&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback