AZ HB2140 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Arizona silver-haired legislature

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arizona silver-haired legislature

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-05-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-05-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2017-02-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-01-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-30HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-01-30HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-19HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-17HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback