AZ HB2137 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; excess insurance policies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; excess insurance policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-01-29HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-29HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-28HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-01-28HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-01-22HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23966Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback