AZ HB2135 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education board; rules; learning outcomes
Title
Education board; rules; learning outcomes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Chapter 289 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (55-5-0-0) |
2021-04-22 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-22 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-22 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-3-1-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-01-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-19 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Credit
Education - Title 15
Graduation
High Schools
Modularization
Powers And Duties
Requirements
Rules
Schools
State Board
State Board Of Education
Education - Title 15
Graduation
High Schools
Modularization
Powers And Duties
Requirements
Rules
Schools
State Board
State Board Of Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 701.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |