AZ HB2132 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Personal mobile cargo carrying devices
Title
Personal mobile cargo carrying devices
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 89 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House TECH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House TECH Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |