AZ HB2129 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; meetings; technical correction
Title
Education; meetings; technical correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | House final reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-21 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-24 | House third reading , voting: (56-0-4-0) | |
2010-03-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0) | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-08 | House ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2010-02-09 | House read second time | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |