AZ HB2127 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Children's health insurance program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's health insurance program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DISC/ONLY) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (46-12-1-0)
2018-01-30HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-30HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-29HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-01-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-17HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362985Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362986Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback