AZ HB2123 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Chapter 279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Funerals; regulation; continuation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funerals; regulation; continuation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-01 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-07SenateChapter 279
2022-06-07SenateGovernor Signed
2022-06-01SenateTransmitted to Governor
2022-06-01HouseHouse concurs
2022-06-01HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (40-6-14-0)
2022-05-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2022-05-25HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2022-05-18HouseTransmit to House
2022-05-18SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-0-5-0)
2022-05-18SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2022-04-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2022-04-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2022-04-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2022-03-31SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0)
2022-03-08SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2022-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2022-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2022-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2022-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2022-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2022-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (44-15-1-0)
2022-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2022-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2022-02-14HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2022-02-08HouseHouse ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-2-0-1-0-0)
2022-01-25HouseHouse read second time
2022-01-24HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2022-01-24HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2022-01-24HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2022-01-24HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15217New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76529
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2123p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2123h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2123s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/laws/0279.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/proposed/H.2123UDALL.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/adopted/H.2123EDUCATION.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/adopted/S.2123APPROP.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/proposed/S.2123LEACH.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/493405
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/494827
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/495543
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/496529
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/498243
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/499277
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/499245
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/499240
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/499492
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76529&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76529&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76529&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76529&billStatusActionId=208745&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76529&billStatusActionId=208952&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76529&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76529&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76529&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#5
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76529&billStatusActionId=211265&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76529&billStatusActionId=211274&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76529&billStatusActionId=211372&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76529&billStatusActionId=211376&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback