AZ HB2122 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Bonds; financial advisory fees
Title
Bonds; financial advisory fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-12-2-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-01-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-01-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |