AZ HB2118 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Unauthorized practice; health professions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unauthorized practice; health professions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-20SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-03-13SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-4-0-0)
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-05HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-05HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-01-31HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-24HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-24HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
323226New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71200
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2118p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2118h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71200&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71200&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71200&billStatusActionId=188049&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71200&billStatusActionId=188164&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71200&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71200&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71200&billStatusActionId=188781&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback