AZ HB2114 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax; returns; filing extension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; returns; filing extension.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-03-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-01-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-01-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2021-01-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-01-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-20HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-20HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
421107Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback