AZ HB2114 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Declaration; independent business status
Title
Declaration; independent business status
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Petersen [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Rep. John Allen [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Jill Norgaard [R] | Rep. Justin Olson [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Chapter 231 | |
2016-05-12 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | House | House final reading , voting: (32-22-6-0) |
2016-05-06 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-2-0) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-2-0) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-22-4-0) |
2016-01-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-01-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-01-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-01-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |