AZ HB2111 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Carbon dioxide emissions committee; repeal
Title
Carbon dioxide emissions committee; repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-4-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Carbon Dioxide Emissions
Joint Legislative Review Committee
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
The Environment - Title 49
Joint Legislative Review Committee
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
The Environment - Title 49
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1291 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1291.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |