AZ HB2106 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency and military affairs; continuation
Title
Emergency and military affairs; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Chapter 71 | |
2015-03-26 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-1-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2015-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to House MAPS Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |