AZ HB2105 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Inmate medical services; rate structure
Title
Inmate medical services; rate structure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House County and Municipal Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House County and Municipal Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Chapter 70 | |
2015-03-26 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House CMA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to House CMA Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned to House CMA Committee |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |