AZ HB2098 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Missing children; law enforcement; reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Missing children; law enforcement; reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19SenateChapter 364
2021-05-19SenateGovernor Signed
2021-05-13SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-05-13HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (58-0-2-0)
2021-05-13HouseHouse concurs
2021-04-29HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2021-04-29HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2021-04-28HouseTransmit to House
2021-04-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2021-04-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-04-12SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-12SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-25SenateSenate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-0)
2021-02-24SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-23SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (54-6-0-0)
2021-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-01HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-21HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-20HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-01-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74486
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2098p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2098h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2098s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0364.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2098engel.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2098jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2098floorengel.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482088
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482933
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484596
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487823
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489281
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489295
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489301
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489592
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74486&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74486&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74486&billStatusActionId=201122&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74486&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74486&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74486&billStatusActionId=203883&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74486&billStatusActionId=203900&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74486&billStatusActionId=204058&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74486&billStatusActionId=204061&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback