AZ HB2097 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Sovereign authority; commandeering; prohibition; exception

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sovereign authority; commandeering; prohibition; exception

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-05-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-05-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-01SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-01HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (38-22-0-0)
2017-01-31HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-01-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-17HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-17HouseHouse FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House FPRPP Committee
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1272New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68557
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2097p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2097h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2097federalism property rights and public policy.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2097thorpe.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68557&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68557&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68557&billStatusActionId=174095&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68557&billStatusActionId=173965&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback