AZ HB2091 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS; orthotic services; restoration
Title
AHCCCS; orthotic services; restoration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-06 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-7-2-0) |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |