AZ HB2089 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-11 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-11 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Military veterans; surviving spouses; scholarships
Title
Military veterans; surviving spouses; scholarships
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-30 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |