AZ HB2087 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Family caregiver income tax credit.
Title
Family caregiver income tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DISC/ONLY) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-14-1-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-10 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 1023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1073.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |