AZ HB2084 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Kinship care; fingerprint requirement; waiver
Title
Kinship care; fingerprint requirement; waiver
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 85 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0) |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Child Safety - Title 8
Child Welfare And Placement
Fingerprint Clearance Cards (s)
Fingerprint Requirements
Kinship Care
Repeal (s)
Restricted Licenses (s)
Waiver
Child Welfare And Placement
Fingerprint Clearance Cards (s)
Fingerprint Requirements
Kinship Care
Repeal (s)
Restricted Licenses (s)
Waiver
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 514.03 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |