AZ HB2083 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Safety features; autonomous vehicles; prohibitions
Title
Safety features; autonomous vehicles; prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-4-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Autonomous Vehicles
Prohibition
Safety Features
Safety Requirements
Transportation
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Safety
Prohibition
Safety Features
Safety Requirements
Transportation
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Safety