AZ HB2082 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance producers; convictions; reporting
Title
Insurance producers; convictions; reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Chapter 31 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-01-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2018-01-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-01-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2018-01-11 | House | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-10 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House BI Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefile |