AZ HB2081 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Risk management; liability; state agencies
Title
Risk management; liability; state agencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - Motion Representative Cook motioned that the House extend its action of Mon., April 25, whereby it passed the motion to reconsider its final reading action on HB 2081 within 14 days and that the time for reconsideration be extended another 14 days. Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - Motion Representative Cook motioned that the House extend its action of Mon., April 25, whereby it passed the motion to reconsider its final reading action on HB 2081 within 14 days and that the time for reconsideration be extended another 14 days. Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - Motion Representative Cook motioned that the House extend its action of Mon., April 25, whereby it passed the motion to reconsider its final reading action on HB 2081 within 14 days and that the time for reconsideration be extended another 14 days. Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - Motion Representative Cook motioned that the House extend its action of Mon., April 25, whereby it passed the motion to reconsider its final reading action on HB 2081 within 14 days and that the time for reconsideration be extended another 14 days. Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Chapter 239 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-18 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (50-0-10-0) |
2022-05-09 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Representative Cook motioned that the House extend its action of Mon., April 25, whereby it passed the motion to reconsider its final reading action on HB 2081 within 14 days and that the time for reconsideration be extended another 14 days. Motion passed v/v. |
2022-04-25 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-04-25 | House | House final reading FAILED, voting: (30-27-3-0) |
2022-04-25 | House | House concurs |
2022-04-25 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-04-25 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-04-19 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-31 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-01-31 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-6-0-1-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12 (s)
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Liability (s)
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Redactions
Risk Management (s)
State Agencies (s)
State Government - Title 41 (s)
State Government Liability (s)
Video Recordings
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Liability (s)
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Redactions
Risk Management (s)
State Agencies (s)
State Government - Title 41 (s)
State Government Liability (s)
Video Recordings