AZ HB2076 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virtual training simulators; location
Title
Virtual training simulators; location
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Senate | Chapter 283 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-27 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (52-8-0-0) |
2019-05-27 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2019-05-27 | House | House final reading FAILED, voting: (28-32-0-0) |
2019-05-27 | House | House concurs |
2019-05-27 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-27 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-7-4-0) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-1-0-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 945 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 956 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |