AZ HB2075 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chapter 313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chapter 313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Radiation regulatory agency; DHS; transfer
Title
Radiation regulatory agency; DHS; transfer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Senate | Chapter 313 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-08 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2017-05-08 | House | House concurs |
2017-04-26 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-26 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2017-02-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-26 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Criminal Code
Department Of Health Services
Military Affairs And Emergency Management
Power
Professions And Occupations
Public Lands
Radiation Regulatory Agency
State Government
The Environment
Criminal Code
Department Of Health Services
Military Affairs And Emergency Management
Power
Professions And Occupations
Public Lands
Radiation Regulatory Agency
State Government
The Environment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 2301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 305.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 306.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 652 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 654 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 656 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 658 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 671 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 681 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 682 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 683 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 685 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 686 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 687 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 688 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 692 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 693 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 694 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 696 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 722 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2843 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3233 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 495.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3018.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |