AZ HB2074 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter 208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Treatment and education facilities; exemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Treatment and education facilities; exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateChapter 208
2019-05-13SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-07SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-06HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2019-04-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-12SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-12SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-11SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-03-11SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-06SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-2-0)
2019-02-26SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-11SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-02-05HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-05HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-04HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-30HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4211001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4211104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4211132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4212009Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71137
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2074p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2074h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0208.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71137&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71137&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71137&billStatusActionId=186081&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71137&billStatusActionId=186125&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71137&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71137&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71137&billStatusActionId=188957&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71137&billStatusActionId=189381&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback