AZ HB2071 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - House APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-9-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - House APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-9-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; repaving; State Route 95
Title
Appropriation; repaving; State Route 95
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-9-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefile |