AZ HB2070 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - House HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Technical correction; midwives

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical correction; midwives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21HouseHouse HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-18HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-01-14HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36751Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback