AZ HB2068 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clinical nurse specialists; prescribing authority
Title
Clinical nurse specialists; prescribing authority
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 87 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-10 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-04-10 | House | House concurs |
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-09 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-04-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (47-10-3-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-01-14 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1631 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1635.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1636 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1651 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1663 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1666 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |