AZ HB2067 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1184
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Residential leases; municipal tax exemption
Title
Residential leases; municipal tax exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-01 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1184 (Replaced by) 2023-02-23 - Governor Vetoed
Subjects
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Municipal Tax
Municipal Tax Exemption
Property - Title 33
Residential Leases
Taxation - Title 42
Counties - Title 11
Municipal Tax
Municipal Tax Exemption
Property - Title 33
Residential Leases
Taxation - Title 42
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 1704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1332 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 15103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6011 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 1304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |