AZ HB2067 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Chapter 159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Chapter 159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal conviction; set aside; applicability
Title
Criminal conviction; set aside; applicability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 159 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-0-8-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House CJR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House CJR Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefile |