AZ HB2066 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House third reading PASSED voting: (35-22-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - House third reading PASSED voting: (35-22-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana fund; uses
Title
Medical marijuana fund; uses
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-22-3-0) |
2018-02-15 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2018-02-15 | House | House third reading None voting: (36-21-3-0) |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-12 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-2-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-5-0-2-0-0) |
2018-01-10 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefile |