AZ HB2064 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Medical marijuana; packaging; labeling

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; packaging; labeling

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-19SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2018-03-14SenateSenate read second time
2018-03-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-13SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-03-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-12HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (52-5-3-0)
2018-02-26HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2018-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (41-15-4-0)
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-13HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-01-03HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362806Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69730
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2064p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2064h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69730&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69730&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69730&billStatusActionId=181568&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69730&billStatusActionId=181595&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69730&billStatusActionId=181764&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69730&billStatusActionId=182410&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69730&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69730&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback