AZ HB2061 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Chapter 92 RFEIR
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Medical marijuana; pregnancy; signage

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; pregnancy; signage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-05 Chapter 92 RFEIR
2016-04-05 Governor Signed
2016-03-30 Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-28SenateTransmit to House
2016-03-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0)
2016-03-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-03-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-14SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-03-01SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-09SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2016-03-02SenateReferred to Senate HHS Committee
2016-03-02SenateSenate read second time
2016-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2016-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-02-25HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2016-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2016-01-12HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-02-16HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-0-0)
2016-01-13HouseReferred to House HEALTH Committee
2016-01-13HouseHouse read second time
2016-01-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-01-12HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=HB2061
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2061p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2061h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0092.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.2061boyer.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.2061friese.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.2061health.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2061.hhealth.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2061.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2061.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2061.shhs.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2061.sthird.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback