AZ HB2060 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental nutrition assistance program; eligibility
Title
Supplemental nutrition assistance program; eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-15-1-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-24 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-01-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-2-0-0) |
2022-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Eligibility
Snap (see Also: Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program)
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (snap)
Welfare - Title 46
Snap (see Also: Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program)
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (snap)
Welfare - Title 46