AZ HB2060 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; pledge; quiet reflection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; pledge; quiet reflection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-02-17HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-11HouseHouse ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-20HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-01-08HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15506Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback