AZ HB2059 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - House GOV Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (5-6-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - House GOV Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (5-6-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Homeowners' associations; billing statements; waiver
Title
Homeowners' associations; billing statements; waiver
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | House GOV Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (5-6-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-12-17 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 1256 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |