AZ HB2056 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - House NREW Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - House NREW Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fifth management period; extension
Title
Fifth management period; extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | House NREW Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-13 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefile |