AZ HB2056 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; Tonto Basin bridge

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Tonto Basin bridge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-05-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-4-0-0)
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-05HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-01-22HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-01-16HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2020-01-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-12-17HousePrefile

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72573
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2056p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2056h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2056campbell.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2056transportation.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72573&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72573&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72573&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72573&billStatusActionId=194277&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72573&billStatusActionId=194325&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback