AZ HB2054 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Foreign nonprofit corporations; foreign LLCs
Title
Foreign nonprofit corporations; foreign LLCs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-1-0) |
2017-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 11501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
10 | 11502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 800 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |