AZ HB2053 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Competency evaluations; reports

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Competency evaluations; reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateChapter 71
2019-04-11SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-04HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0)
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-21SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-02-26SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-15SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-14HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-30HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-01-10HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
134509Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71088
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2053p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2053h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0071.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2053allen j.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2053judiciary.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71088&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71088&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71088&billStatusActionId=186509&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71088&billStatusActionId=186543&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71088&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71088&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71088&billStatusActionId=188730&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71088&billStatusActionId=188801&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback