AZ HB2051 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Procurement; information disclosure; bidders
Title
Procurement; information disclosure; bidders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-01-07 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Bidders
Competitive Bidding
Information Disclosure
Procurement
Procurement Code
State Government - Title 41
Competitive Bidding
Information Disclosure
Procurement
Procurement Code
State Government - Title 41