AZ HB2051 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Senate JUD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (1-6-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

JCCR; membership

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JCCR; membership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (1-6-0-0)
2017-03-22SenateSenate read second time
2017-03-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-03-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-03-21SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-03-21SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0)
2017-02-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-01HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-1-0-0)
2017-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-01-09HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411251Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback