AZ HB2050 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - House final reading FAILED, voting: (34-24-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - House final reading FAILED, voting: (34-24-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Licensing; marijuana establishments
Title
Licensing; marijuana establishments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | House final reading FAILED, voting: (34-24-2-0) |
2022-06-23 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-06-23 | House | House final reading FAILED, voting: (36-22-2-0) |
2022-06-23 | House | House concurs |
2022-06-15 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-06-15 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-06-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-2-3-0) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-1-0-0) |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Complaints (s)
Confidentiality (s)
Disclosure Of Information (s)
Emergency (s)
Licensing (s)
Marijuana (s)
Marijuana Establishments (s)
Posting
Public Health And Safety - Title 36 (s)
Report
Requirements For Enactment (rfe) (s)
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment) (s)
Rulemaking Exemption (s)
Sample Collection And Testing (s)
State Government - Title 41
Telecommunications Fund
Three-fourths Vote (s)
Confidentiality (s)
Disclosure Of Information (s)
Emergency (s)
Licensing (s)
Marijuana (s)
Marijuana Establishments (s)
Posting
Public Health And Safety - Title 36 (s)
Report
Requirements For Enactment (rfe) (s)
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment) (s)
Rulemaking Exemption (s)
Sample Collection And Testing (s)
State Government - Title 41
Telecommunications Fund
Three-fourths Vote (s)