AZ HB2047 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Liquor; serving age; reduction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liquor; serving age; reduction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House of Representatives - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House of Representatives - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House of Representatives - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-21SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-20HouseTransmit to House
2017-03-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0)
2017-03-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-27SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0)
2017-02-20SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-02SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-02HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2017-01-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-30HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-24HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-09HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-01-09HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4205.06Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4244Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68481
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2047p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2047h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68481&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68481&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68481&billStatusActionId=174102&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68481&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68481&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68481&billStatusActionId=176558&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback