AZ HB2045 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1180

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil rights; amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil rights; amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Motion HB 2045 substitited for SB 1180. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04SenateChapter 1
2021-02-04SenateGovernor Signed
2021-02-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-01-28HouseTransmit to House
2021-01-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0)
2021-01-28SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2045 substitited for SB 1180. Motion carried.
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-01-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-01-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2021-01-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-01-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-19HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-13HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-12HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-01-07HousePrefile

Same As/Similar To

SB1180 (Replaces) 2021-01-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411461Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411464Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411481Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411492.09Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74377
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2045p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2045h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0001.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480662
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480850
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481836
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486163
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487027
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74377&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74377&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74377&billStatusActionId=198498&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74377&billStatusActionId=198822&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74377&billStatusActionId=198828&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback