AZ HB2040 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

ESAs; special education services; notification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ESAs; special education services; notification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-13HouseHouse read second time
2022-01-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2022-01-12HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2022-01-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2022-01-05HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152404Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback