AZ HB2037 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical registration board; endorsement registration
Title
Technical registration board; endorsement registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Governor Vetoed | |
2019-04-08 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2019-04-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-3-0-0) |
2019-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-02-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-04 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-28 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Board Of Technical Registration
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Qualifications
State Government - Title 41
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Qualifications
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 122.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 126.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1758 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1758.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 619.51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |