AZ HB2036 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Fentanyl; heroin; carfentanil; mandatory sentencing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fentanyl; heroin; carfentanil; mandatory sentencing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-01-27HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-01-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-01-22HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-16HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2020-01-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-11-20HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133408Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback